Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Strong, Jennifer Beth, against Eclipse Medical Imaging P.C. A A O Syreeta Carmona, represented by Zuppa, Raymond Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Eileen C Daly-Sapraicone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
PETITION
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Arbitration Submission
Date: August 12, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C-2 Part 2 Master Arbitration Submission Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 12, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 22, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Mot. Seq. # 1 & 2 |
||
October 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 22, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action and Costs |
||
September 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmation In Support of Motion |
||
September 22, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
August 29, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 12, 2022 | PETITION | ||
August 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Arbitration Submission Arbitration Submission Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
August 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.