Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The Lcf Group, Inc.,, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Feldman, Adam J, against Busy Bee Wings & Grill Llc, Curry N Grill Llc D B A Bd International Market Aka Halal China Bistro Aka Curry N Grill, Syed Monoar Llc, Syed Monowar, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiccia T Pineda-Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 05, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 05, 2023PETITION
Date: July 05, 2023PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: July 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 25, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: August 24, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 25, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 24, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
August 24, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
August 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 22, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 11, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 25, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Curry N Grill LLC - service of Notice of Petition/Amended Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.