Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gregg Donnenfeld, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Donnenfeld, Gregg Reed, against Houston Specialty Insurance Company, represented by Bennett, Gregory Ross, Rogers, Richard Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Jeffrey Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2020FEDERAL COURT ORDER (COPY)
Date: November 24, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 13, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2020 | FEDERAL COURT ORDER (COPY) | ||
November 20, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) JEFFREY S. BROWN (MOTION PT) EFILED MOTION, 2PGS 11/2/2020 TO JSB Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
November 18, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
November 17, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 13, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
November 12, 2020 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Judge Brown |
||
November 02, 2020 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #001) Before Justice: JEFFREY S. BROWN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: JEFFREY S. BROWN |
|
October 30, 2020 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memo of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #001) Exhibit J |
||
October 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Exhibit I |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.