Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
The Lcf Group, Inc.,, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Feldman, Adam J, against Jose Umana Guevara, Umana Painting Contractors Llc D B A Umana Painting Contractors, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Diccia T Pineda-Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDiccia T Pineda-Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
JUDGMENT
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 27, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: June 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: June 21, 2023PETITION
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 27, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 22, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 22, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
November 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.