Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Holler, Nicole Elizabeth, against Alejandro Mayorga A K A Alejandro Mayorge A K A Alejandro Mayorga Velazquez, American Medical Initiatives, P.C., Anjani Sinha Medical P.C., Atlantic Medical & Diagnostic, P.C., Benson Medical P.C., (total of 22) See All represented by Avshalumov, Roman Mikhail, Bott, Robert Matthew, Rybak, Oleg, Shapiro, Edward, Sledzinski, Matthew Thomas, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 26, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 26, 2024ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 26, 2024STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 25, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C EXECUTED BCL Notice |
||
January 26, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Police Accident Report |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D SIU Affirmation |
||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G NF-2 of ALEJANDRO MAYORGA aka ALEJANDRO MAYORGE aka ALEJANDRO MAYORGA VELAZQUEZ |
||
January 26, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B AOS of Defaulting Defendants |
||
January 26, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 26, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Declaration Page & Policy Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.