Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Fox Capital Group, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kesselman, Joshua A., Klestzick, Yonatan Y., against Gulf Breeze Partners Llc, Intelligent Community Solutions, Kendall Manor, Midas Hospitality, Llc, Relik- Aquarena, Llc, (total of 11) See All represented by Dramer, Kenneth Harlan, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Erica L. Prager presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Fox Capital Group, Inc. against multiple defendants, including Relik Realty, LLC, Intelligent Community Solutions, Kendall Manor, Relik Oakmont Partners LLC, Gulf Breeze Partners LLC, Midas Hospitality, LLC...
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 19, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 18, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 18, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 04, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Pay run
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Funding confirmation
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Agreement
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Pay Run
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Funding Confirmation
Date: June 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement
Date: June 30, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Notice of Entry of Judgement | ||
August 30, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 11, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 17, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) MOTION SEQUENCE 1 & 2 |
||
April 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Records of Outreach to Defendants |
||
April 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) ACH Code Record |
||
April 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Plaintiff's affidavit in opposition |
||
April 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Eagle v Relik |
||
April 18, 2023 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.