Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Valley Container, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Greif, Steven D., against Premium Frozen Foods, Ltd., represented by Kert, Arnold Lance, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Daniel R Palmieri presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions182 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2016SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 26, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2016ANSWER
Date: February 17, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED 12-02-19 |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A with supporting documents |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 31, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) DANIEL R. PALMIERI (MOTN PT) EFILED MOTION,1PG 4/8/16 TO DRP Judge: DANIEL R. PALMIERI |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A supporting documents |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION AFFIDAVIT IN REPLY TO DEFENDANT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.