Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
A. C. Infant By Her M N G Laura Colonna, Laura Colonna Individually, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Schmigelski, Robyn Leibowitz, Widom, Steven Rubin, Yankowitz, Jack A, Yankowitz, Skylar Kody, against Bellmore-Merrick Central High School District, Sanford H. Calhoun High School, represented by Gasser, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Erica L Prager presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management160 days |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligent Supervision) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 02, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 11, 2020SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 18, 2020SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 12, 2020SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: August 20, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 08, 2019PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND *Corrected*
Date: December 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: August 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 10, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 05, 2021ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 08, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 18, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 09, 2021TRANSCRIPT - SO ORDERED
Date: January 14, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) Deft., Bellmore-Merrick UFSD's Reply to Plaintiffs' Rule 202.8-g Response |
||
December 16, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 16, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation of Defendant - Bellmore-Merrick CHSD |
||
November 15, 2022 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
November 15, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Ex A Expert Affidavit |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Plaintiff, A.C.'s 5-4-21 EBT transcript |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Claimant, Laura Colonna's 5-29-19 50h transcript |
||
August 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Affidavit of Donna Roenbeck |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.