Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mathew Schloss Individually, Samuel Schloss, S. S. Infant, By His Father And Natural Guardian Mathew Schloss, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Glickman, Bruce W., against Cameron Engineering & Associates, Llp, County Of Nassau, Laser Industries, L.K. Mclean And Associates, P.C, Nassau County Department Of Parks, Recreation And Museums, (total of 6) See All represented by Biegel, Jason M., Cataldo, Annalee J., Sacket, Lee J, Hoffman, Kerri, Libert, Brian Martin, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 24, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 24, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 07, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 24, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 03, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: August 16, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Depo Trans S. Schloss 3-24-21
Date: October 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: October 23, 2023ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: October 31, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: October 23, 2023COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 24, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - Cap  (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 19, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 07, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 24, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 04, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 18, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 12, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 12, 2020ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: October 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 02, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 02, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE
Date: August 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: August 08, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: May 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | ORDER - CONSOLIDATION | ||
October 31, 2023 | COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES | ||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L Depo Trans of Gulino |
||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Second Amended Complaint |
||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Depo Trans S. Schloss 3-24-21 Depo Trans S. Schloss 3-24-21 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 23, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge |
||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K Depo Trans of Caramitsios |
||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Nassau County's Answer |
||
October 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q McLean Photos |
||
October 23, 2023 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.