Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fritz Dysna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nichols, Regina Cane, against Hugh Blythe, Hugh S. Blythe, John Doe Said Name Being Fictitious And Unknown, Pasquale Nucoforo, represented by Korcz, Amy Beth, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Danielle M Peterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDanielle M Peterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 12, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 27, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 13, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 06, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 17, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 10, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: authorizations |
||
March 27, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: POST EBT DEMAND FOR AUTHORIZATIONS |
||
March 13, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to P Supplemental Demand for Ins. Info |
||
December 12, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 06, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMBINED DEMANDS |
||
November 17, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 14, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 13, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 10, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands, Affirmation of Service |
||
September 21, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.