Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Geico Casualty Co., Geico General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marconi, Jonathan R., against Birch Medical & Diagnostic, P.C., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Christopher G Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2020JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 30, 2021 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
March 24, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 19, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 17, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) THOMAS FEINMAN (MOTION PT) EFILED MOTION, 2PGS 11/5/2020 TO TF Judge: THOMAS FEINMAN |
|
November 09, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 05, 2020 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Before Justice: THOMAS FEINMAN Answer demanded: Yes Judge: THOMAS FEINMAN |
|
November 03, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 03, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - Affirmation of Non-appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.