Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Riverhead Building Supply Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldhaber, Robert D, against Dsm Netzero Construction Llc, Michael Amoashiy, Sofia Amoashiy, represented by Hutchinson, Richard L., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with SHARON M.J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 13, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 01, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 13, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 05, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2020INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 01, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Interrogatories - part 2
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 15, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: April 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 03, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 21, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 13, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: October 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 31, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A7 Â (Motion #003) Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 31, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 19, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 25, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stipulation discontinuing action |
||
August 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 25, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
May 19, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
May 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 09, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 18, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 31, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Statements of Account |
||
January 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) email re: objections to invoice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.