Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
May B. Mushkin Revocable Trust, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Streich, Eric, against Doe Individuals I Through X, Plane Realty, Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Roe Corporations I Through X, Victor Scotto An Individual, represented by Crowe, Vincent W, Granat, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Jeffrey Brown presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 25, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time188 days |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: December 03, 2015JUDGMENT-FOREIGN (5402)
Date: November 25, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) (Motion #001)
Date: May 22, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 13, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2)
Date: October 30, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: October 30, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 21, 2015FOREIGN JUDGMENT
Date: November 25, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: October 30, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 29, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 27, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: March 04, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: November 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: March 19, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 13, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)
Date: November 18, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: October 30, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 28, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 08, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: May 09, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003)
Date: June 03, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 08, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: May 10, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2014ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT
Date: November 30, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 20, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)
Date: November 04, 2015JUDGMENT (AMENDED)
Date: June 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT | |
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Stip Vacating Judgment & Discontinue Action |
|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Appeal Bonds |
|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.