Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Austin Doan, Emily Kleinfelder, Kathryn Hartman, Marwa Khairy, Michael Scappaticci, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Wage and Hour - Labor and Employment case represented by Abrahamson, Sally Jasmine, against Atheneum Partners Llc, represented by Reibstein, Richard Jay, Tisman, Russell Gary, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Philippe Solages presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhilippe Solages Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Unpaid Wages) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeWage and Hour |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: November 28, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: November 30, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2023SUMMONS
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 17, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) for Preliminary Approval of Settlement |
||
December 22, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Firm Resume |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Text of Proposed Order |
||
December 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release Agreement |
||
December 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) for Preliminary Approval of Settlement |
||
December 05, 2023 |
ANSWER Defendant Atheneum's Answer to First Amended Complaint |
||
November 30, 2023 | ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION | ||
November 28, 2023 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected* First Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint |
||
November 28, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.