Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Hideout, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Murtha, Timothy J, against Robert Zigman, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions81 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Case Cycle Time787 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: December 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
October 23, 2017 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
December 03, 2015 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 20, 2015 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 26, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 31, 2015 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.