Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Patricia Kobishyn A K A Patricia A Kobishyn, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions295 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time289 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2016JUDGMENT *Corrected*
Date: June 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2018NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: May 18, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
May 20, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
July 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment entered on 6/15/16 | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT *Corrected* | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order entered on 5/6/16 | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.