Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gina Mianulli, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Caldarella, Jenna Lauren, Cassell, Michael David, against Harry Brown, Jane Brown, represented by Mitkoff, Marci, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with LEONARD STEINMAN presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management92 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1002 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 09, 2018ANSWER
Date: October 16, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 21, 2016ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: April 07, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 18, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 19, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2015STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 10, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 27, 2016ANSWER
Date: December 28, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL CENTRAL JURY STIP/DISC 04/30/18 Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 30, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD0502 Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
February 21, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART LS0322 Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
January 24, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART LS0322 Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
December 13, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART LS0322 Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
November 01, 2017 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD DCM PRETRIAL PART LS0322 Judge: LEONARD STEINMAN |
|
July 25, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.