Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Simmons Jannace Deluca, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Deluca, Sal F, Hannon, Ian Edward, against Incorporated Village Of Freeport, represented by Cohn, Steven, Goldklang, Mitchell Robert, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Sharon Gianelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Gianelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial Division - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 04, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: August 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2023STIPULATION - VENUE
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 31, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: June 29, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 21, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
November 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
November 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) ECF Printout |
||
November 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Affirmation in Reply |
||
November 06, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Stipulation Adjourning Motion |
||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) correspondence |
||
October 31, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
October 31, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
August 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Email Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.