Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Nassau, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Campanelli, Andrew James, against Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp, Thomas Brady, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts with Norman Janowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNorman Janowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 14, 2014RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
Date: August 14, 2014NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 14, 2014NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 16, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2014NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 16, 2014DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING
Date: September 03, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 02, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2014 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) CALENDAR CLERK DEPT STIP/DISC 10/16/14 Judge: NORMAN JANOWITZ |
|
October 16, 2014 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
October 16, 2014 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 03, 2014 | DECISION/ORDER AFTER HEARING entered in the Office of the County Clerk on September 3, 2014 | ||
September 02, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 29, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 29, 2014 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 27, 2014 | Hearing |
DEFT DEFAULT/INACTIVE NORMAN JANOWITZ (HEARING PT) KRIMSTO Judge: NORMAN JANOWITZ |
|
August 14, 2014 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.