Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Zina Dvorkina, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Subin, Herbert S, against 1610 Realty Holdings Llc, Fandoq Restaurant, represented by Hoffman, Joshua Ross, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Francis Ricigliano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis Ricigliano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (General) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 18, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 21, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B Notice of Voluntary Discontinuance Pursuant to CPLR 3217(a)(1) |
||
January 31, 2024 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
January 31, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service for RJI, Notice of Motion and Affirmation in Support |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C Defendant Fandoq's Answer to Verified Complaint |
||
January 31, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
January 31, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint |
||
January 31, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Amend Complaint |
||
August 03, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for E-Filing |
||
August 03, 2023 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Discontinuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.