Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Michael D. Coates, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Buitrago, Marcelo Alejandro, against Joseph K. Coscia, Liberty Home Repair Corp, represented by Candiloros, William N, Schondebare, James Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Rhonda E Fischer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 20, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 10, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: September 10, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 29, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 21, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 18, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 02, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Rhonda E. Fischer |
||
February 02, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Rhonda E. Fischer |
||
January 18, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Rhonda E. Fischer |
||
September 10, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Pleadings |
||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
September 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Order |
||
June 24, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: FOLLOW UP ON POST DEPOSITION DEMANDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.