Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Andrea Niles-Mccargo, Orland Mcrae-Clarke, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Roth, Ronald H., against Gail Babits, Steven Babits, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Helen Voutsinas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 20, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 20, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 02, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 29, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 02, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 29, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 20, 2022 | ANSWER | ||
April 20, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 20, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 03, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons And Complaint |
||
March 03, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement Of Authorization |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.