Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The Lcf Group, Inc.,, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Feldman, Adam J, Rabinovich, Marcella Gabriella, against Andrew Aga, Andrew J Mitchell, Body Shop Llc, Direct Paint, Direct Paint And Body Shop, Llc, (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Helen Voutsinas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: March 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 13, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 17, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2022PETITION
Date: March 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 01, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 06, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: March 17, 2022EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER
Date: April 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 25, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 29, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: April 28, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
April 28, 2022 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED ORDER |
||
April 25, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 15, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 13, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) | ||
April 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 11, 2022 | EMERGENCY APPLICATION - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.