Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Freyda Kolinsky As Executors Of The Estate Of Max Konigsberg, Max Konigsberg, Philip Konigsberg As Executors Of The Estate Of Max Konigsberg, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kelly, Dennis, against North Shore University Hospital, represented by Miskiewicz, Hayley Beth, Newmark, Jenna Christine, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Jerome C. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1046 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 12, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 02, 2015ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: December 17, 2014RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 12, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 15, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 15, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2012RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 27, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance against NSUH |
|
August 11, 2015 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL MED MAL SETTLEMENT PT (TRIAL) Judge: DCM TRIAL JUDGE |
|
July 20, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART JCM0912 Judge: JEROME C. MURPHY |
|
June 22, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM TRIAL PART JCM0912 Judge: JEROME C. MURPHY |
|
May 14, 2015 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD DCM PRETRIAL PART JCM0912 Judge: JEROME C. MURPHY |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant's 3101(D) Expert Disclosure for MD |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant's 3101(D) Expert Disclosure - Nurse |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Expert Witness Exchange Pursuant to CPLR 3101(d) - Dr. Starer |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Expert Witness Exchange Pursuant to CPLR 3101(d) - Christina Decker, RN |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.