Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Progressive Preferred Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zarkower, Michael A, against Qari Zubair, Saira Jamshed, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with ARTHUR M. DIAMOND presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*
Date: December 21, 2012PETITION
Date: December 21, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2013 | Hearing |
Settled Calendar Control Part 2 STAY OF (Conversion) Judge: CCP-J2, |
|
August 21, 2013 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL CALENDAR CONTROL PART 2 STAY OF Judge: CCP J NON JURY |
|
July 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned Calendar Control Part 2 STAY OF (Conversion) Judge: CCP-J2, |
|
July 10, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART 2 STAY OF Judge: CCP J NON JURY |
|
June 12, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned Calendar Control Part 2 STAY OF (Conversion) Judge: CCP-J2, |
|
June 12, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART 2 STAY OF Judge: CCP J NON JURY |
|
May 15, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned Calendar Control Part 2 STAY OF ARBITRATION (Conversion) Judge: CCP-J2, |
|
May 15, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART 2 STAY OF ARBITRATION Judge: CCP J NON JURY |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOTE OF ISSUE AND CERTIFICATE OF READINESS |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.