Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Roy Rachpaul, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Silva, George, against Athlectica Sports System, Inc., New York State Arena Partners, Llc., New York State Urban Development Corporation D B A Empire State Development, Ubs Arena D B A Ubs Arena Foundation, Inc., represented by Fanning, Joseph Denis, Fappiano, Tara C., Kimundi, Elizabeth Katumbi, Mccartney, James William, Mcguire, Gregory, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with James Mccormack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Mccormack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Labor/Product Li) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 18, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 09, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 17, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Email and Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Summons and Complaint |
||
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance |
||
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Affidavit |
||
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Email and Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Answer |
||
January 30, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Answer |
||
January 30, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service |
||
January 30, 2024 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #003) Certification of Signature |
||
January 30, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.