Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Olga M. Guerra, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alter, Mark E, Galvez, Alexander Joseph, against Joanne L. Costa, represented by Feehan, Thomas Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Rhonda E. Fischer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal case filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Olga M. Guerra, is suing the defendant, Joanne L. Costa. The complaint alleges that on March 18, 2023, at around 4:20 p.m., Joanne L....
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 22, 2024ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2024ANSWER
Date: February 29, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: April 29, 2024RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 09, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 22, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
April 22, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 22, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 22, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Request for a Preliminary Conference and Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
April 08, 2024 |
ANSWER Executed Answer Verification |
||
February 29, 2024 |
ANSWER ANS with Demands |
||
February 22, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOANNE L. COSTA |
||
February 09, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 09, 2024 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.