Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Marion Friedrich, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sorce, Joseph Michael, against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Turnstead Property, Llc, represented by Levien, Bradley Jay, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Denise Sher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE
Date: November 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
September 18, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING statement authorizing efiling |
||
September 18, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
August 24, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 19, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
May 31, 2022 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
May 02, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
February 24, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
November 15, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Denise L. Sher |
||
October 04, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.