Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Melinda Ayara v. Rebecca Tracy, John Tracy
On November 16, 2015 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Anna R Anzalone presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 16, 2015
Last Refreshed
January 20, 2021
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Filing Court House
Nassau County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 year, 5 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2016 | hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) ANNA R. ANZALONE (CERT) Judge: ANNA R. ANZALONE |
|
August 11, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED ANNA R. ANZALONE (CERT) Judge: ANNA R. ANZALONE |
|
July 13, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN (CERC) CONTROL Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
June 07, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN (CERC) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
April 06, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN (CERC) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
March 09, 2016 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN (COMC) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
November 16, 2015 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD ANTONIO I.BRANDVEEN (PC PART) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |