Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vincent Donato, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Elefant, Marc, against Karbo Associates, Llc, Starbucks Coffee Company, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Daniel R Palmieri presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel R Palmieri Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management179 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time620 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2011STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2013ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 20, 2012RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 21, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2012PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 21, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2012ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2013ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 12, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 05, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2013 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 12, 2013 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 10, 2013 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE DANIEL R. PALMIERI (CERC) Judge: DANIEL R. PALMIERI |
|
July 26, 2013 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 23, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DANIEL R. PALMIERI (CERC) Judge: DANIEL R. PALMIERI |
|
May 17, 2013 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
May 14, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DANIEL R. PALMIERI (CERC) Judge: DANIEL R. PALMIERI |
|
March 05, 2013 |
ORDER - OTHER conference order 2/28/13 |
||
February 28, 2013 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD DANIEL R. PALMIERI (COMC) Judge: DANIEL R. PALMIERI |
|
January 16, 2013 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DANIEL R. PALMIERI (COMC) Judge: DANIEL R. PALMIERI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.