Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Sarkis, Andreana Maria, against David Kass A K A David J Kass, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions286 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time291 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 31, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: November 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 13, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 06, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Military Investigation | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215(g) |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) Invoice for Service |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Facts by Original Creditor | |
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgement |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.