Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Welvin Pena-Peralta, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Constantinidis, Gus J, Constantinidis, Gus John, against Allison Jean-Baptiste, Filemon Bolanes-Martinez, represented by Sobel, David J, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with R. BRUCE COZZENS JR presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management63 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time683 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: July 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 17, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 18, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: August 18, 2020ANSWER
Date: February 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 07, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (CERC) Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
September 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (CERC) Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
WITHDRAWN (Motion #002) R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (MOTION) EFILE 8/18/2020 NOTICE MOTION Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
August 18, 2020 | Motion |
DISMISS COMPLAINT/PETITION (Motion #002) Decided: 09/21/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) Answer demanded: Yes Judge: R. BRUCE COZZENS JR. (DCM) |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) *Corrected* | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Preliminary Conference Stipulation & Order |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Answer & discovery demands |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons & Complaint |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.