Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anthony Mileo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Edelman, Herbert Melvin, against Raymond J. Maffei, Ryan J. Maffei, represented by Glucksman, James, Rattet, Robert Leslie, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time130 days |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2019ANSWER
Date: June 10, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 27, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.