Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Michelle T. Witter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Moldovan, Neil, against Casey Samuel Shamey, represented by Dennin, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with John Galasso presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management175 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time475 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 05, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2019ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: September 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: May 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 28, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 28, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 20, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) JOHN M. GALASSO (CERC) STIP/DISC 4/3/2020 Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
April 01, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE 09:30 A.M. Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
April 01, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JOHN M. GALASSO (CERC) 09:30 A.M. Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
March 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JOHN M. GALASSO (CERC) 09:30 A Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
February 13, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED JOHN M. GALASSO (CERC) 09:30 A.M. Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN (COMC) Judge: ANTONIO I. BRANDVEEN |
|
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD JOHN M. GALASSO (COMC) Judge: JOHN MICHAEL GALASSO |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.