Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farah M. Khan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by De Meo, Craig Charles, against Erika B. Osbeck, represented by Fitzgerald, Kathryn Mary, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Randy Sue Marber presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management241 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 29, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 08, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 19, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 06, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 06, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
RANDY SUE MARBER (CERC) CHRE Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED RANDY SUE MARBER (CERC) 11:00AM BY PHONE Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
July 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED RANDY SUE MARBER (CERC) 11:30AM BY PHONE Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
May 22, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED RANDY SUE MARBER (CERC) Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
April 08, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED RANDY SUE MARBER (CERC) Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
January 08, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD RANDY SUE MARBER (COMC) Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
September 25, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD RANDY SUE MARBER (PC) Judge: RANDY SUE MARBER |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.