Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, As Trustee For Upland Mortgage Loan Trust A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Manniello, Michael C, Sherer, Joshua Alan, against Abraham West, represented by Hairston, Joylette Racia, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Fsp-J presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time239 days |
ANSWER
Date: August 08, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION *Corrected*
Date: June 07, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 15, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS *Corrected* Stipulation |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) *Corrected* Stipulation |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE | |
September 18, 2019 | Hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: OTHER (U) FORECLOSURE-SP SETTLEMENT CONF Judge: FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF PT |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C STIPULATION CANCELLING NOP |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B NOA |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOP |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C STIP TO DISCONTINUE ACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.