Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Buonamici, A. Albert, against Cyrus Yomtobian, Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Joel Asarch presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 19, 2012 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time124 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 15, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 18, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 02, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 19, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: April 23, 2012RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 19, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2012STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 21, 2012PETITION *Corrected*
Date: April 20, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED So ordered stipulation entered by the C.C. on August 21, 2012. |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry |
|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) Short form order entered by the C.C. on July 18, 2012. |
|
July 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Defendants Affidavit in opposition to Order to show cause, and Affidavit of service thereof. |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.