Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Skymaster International Ltd., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Marco, George A, against Island Swimming Sales, Inc. D B A Island Recreational, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Ira Warshawsky presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 20, 2010 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time654 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2010RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2010STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 04, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Motion sequence notice |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) affidavit of service |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) RJI |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit C |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit B |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) exhibit C |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) exhibit B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.