Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Pearl Delta Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cohen, Theodore J, Murray, Christopher Ryan, Spinella, Phillip Anthony, against Juan Ruiz Jr, Peak Title Agency Co. A K A Peak Title Co, Tobby Jablonski, represented by Dale, Dominick R., in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Conrad D. Singer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConrad D. Singer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
AFFIRMATION
Date: August 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 29, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: February 16, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 16, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 16, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 16, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 16, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 25, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 06, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: September 29, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 17, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 29, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
September 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Emails from ABF/petition |
||
September 20, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A E-mail Correspondence |
||
September 19, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter re: Proposed Order |
||
September 19, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004) | ||
September 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Courtesy Copies of Authorities |
||
September 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) Courtesy Copies of Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.