Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Michael Steinberg, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schnur, Yifat Vered, against Bt Supplies West, Inc., Stephen Odzer, Yanky Holding Supplies Inc., represented by Jaroslawicz, David, Tolchin, David, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Erica L Prager presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 07, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 22, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 05, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY corrected |
||
October 07, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Deposition and Documentary Discovery |
||
October 07, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 22, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
February 05, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) As to year of the return date: 2021 |
||
February 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
February 03, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.