Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Last Chance Funding, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Feldman, Adam J, against Jacqueline Conde, Learn & Play Center, Inc. D B A Learn & Play Center, represented by Zareh, Omid, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 16, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 02, 2020CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)
Date: December 20, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 17, 2020JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: December 20, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 16, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 16, 2020BILL OF COSTS
Date: December 20, 2019ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFF OF EMERGENCY |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF J. CONDE, EXHIBITS & AFFIRMATION O. ZAREH |
|
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | |
January 16, 2020 | Motion |
O.S.C.-VACATE/MODIFY ORDER/JGM (Motion #001) Decided: 01/16/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN Answer demanded: No Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
January 16, 2020 | Hearing |
WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN MOTION W/D PER STIP Judge: DICCIA PINEDA-KIRWAN |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.