Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alpha Capital Source Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Verstandig, Jacob Israel, against International Autos Inc D B A Auto Mall Usa, Mikal Raymond James Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: March 12, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 12, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION In Support |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of 3215 Notice, mailed 2.14.20 |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Non Military Redacted per 22 NYCRR Non Military Redacted |
|
February 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S+C, Individual. Served 1.31.20 |
|
February 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S+C, International Autos Inc DBA Auto Mall USA, served 1.16.20 |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.