Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hewlett Realty Development, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Fromewick, Richard G, against Nassau County, The Assessor And The Assessment Review Commission Of The County Of Nassau, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Tax Cert Judge presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management6 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: December 04, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: December 10, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: December 07, 2022RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: December 10, 2019INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: December 10, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 03, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 06, 2021 | Hearing |
TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT RERE Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
January 05, 2021 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT RERE Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 07, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
December 11, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL PC PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | |
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL PC PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.