Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jane & Larry Nitzky, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Renda, Robert Luigi, against Nassau County Assessor And The Board Of Assessment Review, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Stephen A. Bucaria presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1195 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1170 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 08, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: April 09, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 28, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - SETTLED STEPHEN A. BUCARIA (COURT PART) PER O&J Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) 3598N |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 3598N |
|
December 11, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
September 04, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
May 08, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
February 20, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
November 28, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
July 20, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.