Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Embassy - President Apartments, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Mineola, Village Of, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Vito M Destefano presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time919 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 23, 2015TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: August 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED VILLAGE TAX APP EX Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
October 11, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX STATUS CONF Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
June 07, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX STATUS CONF Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
September 13, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX 2 Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.