Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Pouchon, Inc. v. The Board Of Assessors And The Assessors And The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Village Of Farmingdale And The Village Of Farmingdale
A Real Property - Tax Certiorari case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. Judge Nassau Tax presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 23, 2024
Filing Location
Nassau County, NY
Judge
Hon. Nassau Tax
Category
Real Property - Tax Certiorari
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
Assessment Challenge
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a notice of petition and petition for review of a tax assessment under Article 7 of the Real Property Tax Law. The petitioner, POUCHON, INC., is represented by CRONIN, HARRIS & ASSOCIATES, P.C. The petition alleges that the resp…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Sep 01, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: Sep 01, 2023RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: Sep 01, 2023TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: Aug 31, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
September 01, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
September 01, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | ||
August 31, 2023 | TAX CERTIORARI PETITION |