Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vincent Dejana & Catherine Batch, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Nassau, County Of, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Tax Cert Judge presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management84 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: January 03, 2019RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: March 12, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: March 12, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2021 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
July 07, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CERTIFICATION CONFERENCE Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 10, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.