Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joh Real Estate, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Nassau, County Of, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with STEPHEN A. BUCARIA presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management77 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions260 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time375 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 20, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: March 08, 2019INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: March 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2019RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: March 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 08, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: January 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 06, 2020 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TAX CERT CONTROL PART PER O/J Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 16, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 21, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL PC PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.