Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Angelo Abballe, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Assessment Review Commission Of Nassau County, Board Of Assessors Of Nassau County, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with STEPHEN A. BUCARIA presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management75 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions251 days |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time351 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: December 20, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: January 03, 2019RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: March 06, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: March 06, 2019INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: March 06, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 11, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TAX CERT CONTROL PART PER O/J Judge: STEPHEN A. BUCARIA |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | |
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERT CONTROL PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 19, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL PC PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.