Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Caw Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Rockville Centre, Village Of, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Tax Cert Judge presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management22 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 18, 2019TAX CERTIORARI PETITION
Date: January 03, 2019RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: January 18, 2019JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 14, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: January 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
VILLAGE TAX STATUS CONF
Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
September 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED VILLAGE TAX Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
April 22, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL STATUS PT Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
January 25, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD TAX CERT CONTROL PC PART Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.